+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4285.)
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: AB 1772 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor