+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3052.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2641.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1700.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
On January 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: AB 177 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB177 Bonilla By Hill
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 6, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
July 6, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2015: AB 177 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor