+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 3426.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2758.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 2. Page 1633.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 8).
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 11, 2019: AB 1768 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1768 Carrillo By Hill
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 13, 2019: AB 1768 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 7
May 8, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor