+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 666, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 3029.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2447.).
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1633.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 5, 2019: AB 1763 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1763 Chiu By Beall
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2019: AB 1763 Chiu Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
May 1, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor