+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2085.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 29, 2019: AB 1753 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 6
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor