+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 14, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor