+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5387.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S.
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 18, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 9
May 29, 2018: AB 1752 LOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Low
Type:
Primary Sponsor