+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.)
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2018: AB 1744 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor