+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4855.)
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2016: AB 1743 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 3, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor