+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 454, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 6136.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5015.).
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 14. Page 4703.)
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 24, 2022: AB 1742 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
August 23, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1742 Robert Rivas By Umberg
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2022: AB 1742 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 13
May 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor