+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3273.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2715.).
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1909.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2019: AB 1736 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 9, 2019: Special Consent AB1736
- Yeas: 40
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 23, 2019: AB 1736 Daly Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor