+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3