+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 634, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 3516.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2807.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and EQ.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1582.)
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2019: AB 1730 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1730 Gonzalez By Hueso
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2019: AB 1730 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 1, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor