+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6360.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5215.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH.
On January 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2016: AB 1726 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1726 Bonta By Pan
- Yeas: 39
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2016: AB 1726 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 15, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor