+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 886, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4722.).
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4).
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5292.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1723 Nazarian By Hueso
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 28, 2014: AB 1723 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 8, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor