+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
On January 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
April 27, 2016: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor