+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 885, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 6583.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.)
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 4855.).
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 5340.).
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5219.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 23).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and REV. & TAX.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 27, 2014: AB 1717 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1717 Perea By Hill Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
August 11, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2014: AB 1717 PEREA Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
April 21, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor