+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5378.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.)
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4347.).
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2009.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1721.)
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2020: AB 1710 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
August 27, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1710 Wood By Roth
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
August 8, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 28, 2019: AB 1710 Wood Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor