+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wilk.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
On January 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 19, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2017: AB 171 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor