+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 174, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2637.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2636.)
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2120.).
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced measure version corrected.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1850.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 2.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 20, 2017: AB 1707 LOW Concurrence - Urgency Added By BROUGH
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 11
July 20, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Low By Pan Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 10, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2017: AB 1707 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor