+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2853.).
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18).
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1573.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Berman By McGuire
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2019: AB 1707 Berman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
May 1, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor