+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6107.).
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4501.).
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4755.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 18, 2014: AB 1705 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 14, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1705 Williams By Leno
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 10, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2014: AB 1705 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 30, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor