+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2120.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2019: AB 1703 Bloom Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor