+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 477, Statutes of 2022.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5976.).
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
On January 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 22, 2022: AB 1703 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 17, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1703 Ramos et al. By Limón
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 1703 Ramos Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
March 23, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor