+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5636.).
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4646.).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4624.)
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15).
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 1, 2016: AB 1702 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 30, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1702 Mark Stone
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2016: Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2016: AB 1702 STONE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2016: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor