+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.)
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 18, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor