+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3272.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2709.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1572.)
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2019: AB 1699 Levine Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 9, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 Levine By Jackson
- Yeas: 40
July 10, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2019: AB 1699 Levine Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
April 30, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2019: No Votes Recorded: Cervantes
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor