+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 8).
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
March 8, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor