+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- Died in committee--Concurrence pending.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5162.).
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1483.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1059.)
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Senate.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 6, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1698 Daly By Glazer
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
July 2, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
May 11, 2017: AB 1698 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Sessio
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 11, 2017: AB 1698 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
March 29, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor