+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5590.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4629.).
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 5137.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (May 27).
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
June 30, 2016: AB 1695 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1695 Bonta By Jackson
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 20, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 20, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2016: AB 1695 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor