+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 30).
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor