+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6350.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4706.).
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4960.)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2014: AB 1690 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1690 Gordon By Beall
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
May 15, 2014: AB 1690 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor