+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 5052.).
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 14.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
- Coauthors revised.
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1686 Bryan et al. By Skinner
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 21, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
May 26, 2022: AB 1686 Bryan Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 6
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor