+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2077.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2017: AB 1683 BURKE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
May 3, 2017: Set, [First] hearing. Referred to suspense file.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor