+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor