+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 3133.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 2524.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 1906.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 1680 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1680 Limón By Jackson
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 1680 Limón Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 4
April 22, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor