+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5523.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5523.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 6)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ. and GOV. & F.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1624.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On January 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
On January 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 1, 2020: AB 168 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
August 31, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB168 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Wieckowski Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 6, 2020: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
May 13, 2019: AB 168 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor