+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 19, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor