+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor