+ − Summaries (14)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On July 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 33. Page 5588.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5587.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4629.).
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 33. Page 5134.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15).
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
June 30, 2016: AB 1673 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1673 Gipson By Hall
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 20, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 20, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2016: AB 1673 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
March 15, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor