+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 3939.)
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (January 23).
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 9).
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 17, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 11, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2020: AB 1672 Bloom Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 8
January 23, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor