+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor