+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 874, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6117.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5023.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 4673.)
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4567.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 20).
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and L. GOV.
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 23, 2016: AB 1669 HERNÁNDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1669 Roger Hernández By Leno
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 5, 2016: AB 1669 HERNÁNDEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
April 6, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor