+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1724.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 2, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 20, 2019: AB 1665 Chau Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor