+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 753, Statutes of 2022.
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5365.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4908.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HIGHER ED.
On January 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
On January 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 31, 2022: AB 1655 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 31, 2022: Special Consent AB1655
- Yeas: 40
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2022: AB 1655 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
March 30, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor