+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 1504.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 23).
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2019: AB 1652 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 7
April 23, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor