+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 815, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6338.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5297.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5019.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2016: AB 1651 OBERNOLTE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1651 Obernolte By Hill
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2016: AB 1651 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
March 30, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor