+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and ED.
On January 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
On January 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor