+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2647.).
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1886.).
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1328.)
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On January 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
On January 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2013: AB 165 GAINES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
August 19, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB165 Beth Gaines By Gaines
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
July 1, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2013: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
May 9, 2013: AB 165 GAINES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 1, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 16, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor