+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 589, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3310.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2682.).
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21).
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 1788.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1708.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 3).
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 13, 2017: AB 1647 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1647 Muratsuchi et al. By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: AB 1647 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 6
May 3, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2